blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0077766

EP0077766 - Driving arrangement for the forward and thread-cutting motion of the tool slide of lathes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.1987
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.03.1987 [1987/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft
Werksgelände
A-4010 Linz / AT
[1983/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Schönauer, Alois
Westbahnstrasse 120
A-4300 St.Valentin / AT
[1983/17]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Gerhard, et al
Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7
4021 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [1983/17]Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7
A-4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date82890111.603.08.1982
[1983/17]
Priority number, dateAT1981000392611.09.1981         Original published format: AT 392681
[1983/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0077766
Date:27.04.1983
Language:DE
[1983/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0077766
Date:18.07.1984
Language:DE
[1984/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0077766
Date:19.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.1984
ClassificationIPC:B23G1/04
[1983/17]
CPC:
B23G3/00 (EP); B23Q16/003 (EP); B23Q5/22 (KR)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1983/17]
TitleGerman:Antriebsanordnung für die Vorschub- und Gewindeschneidbewegung des Werkzeugschlittens von Drehmaschinen[1983/17]
English:Driving arrangement for the forward and thread-cutting motion of the tool slide of lathes[1983/17]
French:Condition de commande de commandes d'avance et de filetage d'un chariot de tours[1983/17]
Examination procedure02.08.1984Examination requested  [1984/41]
22.08.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
06.09.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1985Fee for grant paid
14.10.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2732241  (ELLER VERTRIEBS INGBUERO, et al);
 [A]DE1063875  (GILDEMEISTER WERKZEUGMASCH);
 [A]DE1477852  (GROSSMASCHB VEB);
 [A]FR2323916  (WALTERSCHEID GMBH JEAN [DE]);
 [A]FR1361191  (FISCHER & LUDLOW LTD);
 [A]DE1141509  (EUGEN WEISSER & CO K G);
 [A]DE1196025  (WILHELM SIHN JR KG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.