blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0074409

EP0074409 - ANTISTATIC AGENT FOR SYNTHETIC POLYMER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.1987
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.1997Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.1997 [1997/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAKEMOTOYUSHI CO. LTD
2-5, Minatomachi
Gamagorishi Aichi 443 / JP
[1983/12]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAOKA, Yoshihiko
30-7, Miyukicho
Gamagorishi Aichi 443 / JP
02 / SUGIURA, Fumitoshi
26-5, Takenoyacho-Sakuma
Gamagorishi Aichi 443 / JP
[1983/12]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd, et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/12]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date82900829.116.03.1982
[1983/12]
WO1982JP00070
Priority number, dateJP1981003652216.03.1981         Original published format: JP 3652281
[1983/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO8203220
Date:30.09.1982
[1982/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0074409
Date:23.03.1983
Language:EN
[1983/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0074409
Date:02.07.1986
Language:EN
[1986/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.1983
ClassificationIPC:C08K5/42, C08L101/00, C08L71/02
[1983/12]
CPC:
C08K5/42 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1983/12]
TitleGerman:ANTISTATISCHES HILFSMITTEL FÜR SYNTHETISCHES POLYMERMATERIAL[1983/12]
English:ANTISTATIC AGENT FOR SYNTHETIC POLYMER MATERIAL[1983/12]
French:AGENT ANTISTATIQUE POUR UN MATERIAU POLYMERE SYNTHETIQUE[1983/12]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Entry into regional phase16.11.1982Translation filed 
16.11.1982National basic fee paid 
16.11.1982Search fee paid 
16.11.1982Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.1983Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/29]
09.08.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.06.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
31.10.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.1985Fee for grant paid
19.12.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.04.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.03.1983M02   Fee paid on   29.04.1983
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH0412772B
ExaminationJPS4012772B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.