Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0091946

EP0091946 - MEANS FOR MAINTAINING ATTACHED FLOW OF A FLOWING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.1988
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.1989Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.05.1989 [1989/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHEELER, Gary O.
1080 Vallejo Circle
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
[1983/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1983/43]
Representative(s)Madgwick, Paul Roland , et al
Ladas & Parry
Altheimer Eck 2
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/43]Madgwick, Paul Roland , et al
Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date82903414.901.10.1982
[1983/43]
WO1982US01431
Priority number, dateUS1981031473526.10.1981         Original published format: US 314735
[1983/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8301421
Date:28.04.1983
[1983/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0091946
Date:26.10.1983
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1983
[1983/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0091946
Date:19.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.1984
ClassificationInternational:B62D35/00, B64C23/06
[1987/34]
Former International [1983/43]B62D35/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1983/43]
TitleGerman:MITTEL ZUR AUFRECHTHALTUNG DES FLIESSENS IN EINEM FLIESSENDEM MEDIUMS[1983/43]
English:MEANS FOR MAINTAINING ATTACHED FLOW OF A FLOWING MEDIUM[1983/43]
French:DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE CONSERVER L'UNITE D'ECOULEMENT D'UN MILIEU EN ECOULEMENT[1983/43]
Entry into regional phase19.07.1983National basic fee paid 
19.07.1983Search fee paid 
19.07.1983Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.1983Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.1983Examination requested  [1984/02]
22.02.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
24.09.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
02.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.1987Fee for grant paid
08.04.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.05.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.198605   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1986
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE31.08.1987
[1989/19]
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2800291  ;
 [X]GB922900  ;
 [Y]GB1452670
International search[YP]US4343506  ;
 [Y]US3910623  ;
 [Y]US4268892  ;
 [A]US3672718
Examination   - WOLF HEINRICH HUCHO - AERODYNAMIK DES AUTOMOBILS- WÜRZBURG 1981, p. 268,269