Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0088864

EP0088864 - High-frequency artificial respiration apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.1987
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl A. Hoyer GmbH
Parkallee 44
D-2800 Bremen 1 / DE
[1983/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Lasthaus, Hubertus
Am Richtsberg 88/1102
D-3550 Marburg / DE
[1983/38]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J. , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/38]Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date83100207.612.01.1983
[1983/38]
Priority number, dateDE1982320941316.03.1982         Original published format: DE 3209413
[1983/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0088864
Date:21.09.1983
Language:DE
[1983/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0088864
Date:15.08.1984
Language:DE
[1984/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.1984
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00
[1983/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1983/38]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur hochfrequenten maschinellen Beatmung[1983/38]
English:High-frequency artificial respiration apparatus[1983/38]
French:Appareil pour la respiration artificielle haute-fréquence[1983/38]
File destroyed:28.04.1993
Examination procedure16.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/15]
28.11.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
07.11.1987Application withdrawn by applicant  [1988/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.198503   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.1985
31.01.198604   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.1986
02.02.198705   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1987
Documents cited:SearchDE2932161  [ ];
 GB2026326  [ ];
 GB2016279  [ ];
 WO8001646  [ ];
 WO8203014  [ ];
 FR2519254  [ ];
 GB1528279  [ ];
 GB2055307  [ ];
 US4038980  [ ];
 FR1494303  [ ]