blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0085955

EP0085955 - Switch for light guides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/33]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Störk, Peter
Am Lindenberg 143
D-8134 Pöcking / DE
02 / Thom, Günter
Untertaxetweg 6
D-8035 Gauting / DE
[1983/33]
Application number, filing date83101025.103.02.1983
[1983/33]
Priority number, dateDE1982320393005.02.1982         Original published format: DE 3203930
[1983/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0085955
Date:17.08.1983
Language:DE
[1983/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0085955
Date:11.06.1986
Language:DE
[1986/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0085955
Date:19.07.1989
Language:DE
[1989/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1986
ClassificationIPC:G02B26/02, G02B6/38
[1989/29]
CPC:
G02B6/3508 (EP,US); G02B6/3552 (EP,US); G02B6/3574 (EP,US);
G02B6/358 (EP,US); G02B6/3582 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1983/33]G02B7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/33]
TitleGerman:Schalter für Lichtleiter[1983/33]
English:Switch for light guides[1983/33]
French:Interrupteur pour guide d'onde optique[1983/33]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure07.07.1986Examination requested  [1986/37]
03.11.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.12.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.10.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.1988Fee for grant paid
10.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.198907   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.1989
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.07.1989
FR19.07.1989
GB19.07.1989
IT19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
AT03.02.1990
SE04.02.1990
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
[2002/24]
Former [1999/42]BE19.07.1989
GB19.07.1989
IT19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
AT03.02.1990
SE04.02.1990
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
Former [1991/42]BE19.07.1989
GB19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
AT03.02.1990
SE04.02.1990
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
Former [1991/12]BE19.07.1989
GB19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
SE04.02.1990
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
Former [1991/09]GB19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
SE04.02.1990
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
Former [1990/50]GB19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
SE04.02.1990
Former [1990/42]GB19.07.1989
NL19.07.1989
Former [1990/12]NL19.07.1989
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2384276  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]);
 [A]US4186997  (SCHUMACHER WILLIAM L [US]);
 [A]DE2903848  (SIEMENS AG)
Examination   - 7th European Conf. on Optical Comm., Copenhagen, 1981, p. 15-1 bis 15-4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.