Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0087084

EP0087084 - Control device with illuminated control knobs for heating, cooling and ventilating installations in motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  14.01.1994
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/35]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hildebrand, Reinhard
Hauptstrasse 11
D-8621 Redwitz / DE
02 / Waldmann, Bernd
Gries 19
D-8621 Redwitz / DE
[1983/35]
Application number, filing date83101335.411.02.1983
[1983/35]
Priority number, dateDE1982320628822.02.1982         Original published format: DE 3206288
[1983/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0087084
Date:31.08.1983
Language:DE
[1983/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0087084
Date:15.02.1984
Language:DE
[1984/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0087084
Date:16.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0087084
Date:02.03.1994
Language:DE
[1994/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1983
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/00, G05G1/00, B60Q3/04
[1983/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1983/35]
TitleGerman:Steuergerät mit beleuchteten Betätigungsknöpfen für Heizungs-,Klima- und Lüftungsanlagen in Kraftfahrzeugen[1983/35]
English:Control device with illuminated control knobs for heating, cooling and ventilating installations in motor vehicles[1983/35]
French:Dispositif de commande à boutons de commande illuminés pour installations de chauffage, de climatisation et de ventilation dans véhicules moteur[1983/35]
Examination procedure11.02.1983Examination requested  [1983/35]
03.06.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.03.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
21.10.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.03.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.1987Fee for grant paid
26.03.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.06.1988  28.06.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Behr GmbH & Co.
Mauserstrasse 3
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
 [1991/01]
Former [1988/31]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.1988   
Süddeutsche Kühlerfabrik Julius Fr. Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
22.07.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.05.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.05.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
24.08.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
17.04.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.1990Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.10.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
29.06.1993Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.06.1993Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.10.1993Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.10.1993Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.12.1991Appeal received No.  T0988/91
28.02.1992Statement of grounds filed
29.06.1993Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
29.06.1993Date of oral proceedings
19.07.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.1990
BE28.02.1990
NL01.09.1990
SE12.02.1993
[2003/31]
Former [1991/24]AT11.02.1990
BE28.02.1990
NL01.09.1990
Former [1991/18]AT11.02.1990
NL01.09.1990
Former [1991/17]AT11.02.1990
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE1655102  ;
 [AD]DE2852452  (KAMMERER GMBH M);
 [Y]DE2418226  (DAIMLER BENZ AG);
 [Y]US3755662  (RAMSEY C);
 [A]US3589206  (HERBON LEROY J);
 [A]FR2446737  (FERODO SA);
 [A]DE2336506  (DEUTSHER PTY LTD);
 [A]FR2352336  (RENAULT [FR]);
 [A]DE1129388  (DAIMLER BENZ AG);
 [E]FR2511522  (VALEO [FR]);
 [A]EP0000046  (RENAULT [FR]);
 [A]US2933942  (BOYLAN HENRY W, et al);
 [A]DE2361696  (DAIMLER BENZ AG);
 [A]DE898858  (EBERSPAECHER J);
 [A]GB1287120  (BRITISH LEYLAND AUSTIN MORRIS)