Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0089589 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0089589



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 555
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
25.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
16.07.2007 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
22.09.1994 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
11.08.1994 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.08.1994 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.08.1994 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.07.1994 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
02.07.1994 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
02.07.1994 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
25.04.1994 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
25.04.1994 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
25.04.1994 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
25.04.1994 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
19.04.1994 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
20.01.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.01.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.10.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.10.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.10.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.10.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
15.10.1993 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
17.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.07.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.06.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.06.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
16.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
16.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
16.06.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.06.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.06.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
14.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
14.06.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.06.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.06.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.06.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.06.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.06.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.02.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.02.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.02.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.02.1993 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
27.01.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.01.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
25.01.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.01.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
30.11.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
17.11.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
10.07.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
30.06.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.06.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.06.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.06.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.06.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
15.06.1992 Text intended for grant Opposition 4
27.05.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.05.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.05.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.05.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.05.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.04.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
23.04.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
13.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.04.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.04.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.04.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
27.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.03.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.03.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
19.03.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
07.03.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.02.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.02.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.02.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
05.02.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
05.02.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
03.02.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.11.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.1990 Claims Appeal 1
16.11.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
21.09.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.05.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.05.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.05.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.05.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.05.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 2
10.05.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.05.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.04.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.04.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 8
02.04.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.04.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.03.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
29.03.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
29.03.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
29.03.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.1990 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.1990 Means of redress Opposition 1
29.03.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
29.03.1990 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.1990 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.1990 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
29.09.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
20.09.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.09.1989 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.08.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.08.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.08.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.08.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.08.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
22.08.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.1989 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.08.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.08.1989 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
04.08.1989 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
03.08.1989 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.07.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
27.07.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.1989 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.07.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
21.07.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.07.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.07.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
01.03.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
05.01.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
28.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.12.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.12.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
05.11.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
04.08.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.07.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.04.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1988 Request for documents Opposition 1
18.01.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.01.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.01.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.01.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
12.01.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
22.12.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.12.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
14.12.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
09.03.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.12.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.12.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.12.1986 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.10.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
30.09.1986 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.09.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.09.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
25.08.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
05.08.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
17.07.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.05.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
16.05.1986 Description Search / examination 6
16.05.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.03.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.03.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.01.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.03.1985 Claims Search / examination 3
04.03.1985 Description Search / examination 5
04.03.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.01.1985 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.12.1984 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.10.1984 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
03.10.1983 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.08.1983 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.07.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.07.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
27.04.1983 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.03.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.03.1983 Claims Search / examination 4
12.03.1983 Description Search / examination 6
12.03.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.1983 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.03.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
12.03.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
12.03.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
12.03.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
12.03.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
12.03.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.03.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.03.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
12.03.1983 Priority document Search / examination 11
12.03.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10