Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0090997

EP0090997 - Adhesive wound covering material comprising collagen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.1990
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.09.1990 [1990/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Ruhland Nachf. GmbH
Stadtplatz 7
D-8425 Neustadt/Donau / DE
[1983/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Stemberger, Axel, Dr.-rer.nat.
Cramer-Klett-Strasse 35e
D-8014 Neubiberg / DE
[1983/41]
Representative(s)Hansen, Bernd , et al
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/17]Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Former [1983/41]Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date83102773.521.03.1983
[1983/41]
Priority number, dateDE1982321241202.04.1982         Original published format: DE 3212412
[1983/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0090997
Date:12.10.1983
Language:DE
[1983/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0090997
Date:30.10.1985
Language:DE
[1985/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0090997
Date:18.10.1989
Language:DE
[1989/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.1985
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/04, A61L15/03
[1983/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/41]
TitleGerman:Gewebeverklebbare kollagene Wundauflage[1983/41]
English:Adhesive wound covering material comprising collagen[1983/41]
French:Matériau adhésif de recouvrement des plaies à base de collagène[1983/41]
Examination procedure02.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/23]
31.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.1989Fee for grant paid
14.06.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.07.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2422407  (UNITIKA LTD [JP]);
 [XP]EP0059265  (HORMON CHEMIE MUENCHEN [DE]);
 [XP]EP0049469  (RUHLAND NACHF GMBH DR [DE]);
 [XP]EP0068047  (STROETMANN M SERAPHARM)
 [Y]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 94, Nr. 2, 12. Januar 1981, Seite 246, Nr. 7649t, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. STEMBERGER u.a.: "Biochemical and physiological aspects of fibrin adhesion" & FIBRINOGEN, FIBRIN FIBRINKLEBER, VERHANDLUNGSBER. DTSCH. ARBEITSGEM. BLUTGERINNUNGSFORSCH. TAG., 23rd 1979 (Pub. 1980), 209-16,