Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0091079

EP0091079 - Power MOSFET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.1988
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.1988 [1988/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1983/41]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanabe, Hirohito
B-15-12, Shonan-Life-town 688-1, Endo
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Ohata, Yu
1-11-7, Horinouchi
Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP
03 / Miwa, Yukiharu
2-14-9, Shinkoyasu
Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi / JP
04 / Kuramoto, Tsuyoshi
8-24-2, Konandai
Konan-ku Yokohama-shi / JP
[1983/41]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/41]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date83103132.329.03.1983
[1983/41]
Priority number, dateJP1982005448501.04.1982         Original published format: JP 5448582
[1983/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0091079
Date:12.10.1983
Language:EN
[1983/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0091079
Date:23.11.1983
Language:EN
[1983/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0091079
Date:10.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1983
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/78, H01L29/08
[1983/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1983/41]
TitleGerman:Leistungs-MOSFET[1983/41]
English:Power MOSFET[1983/41]
French:Transistor à effet de champ MOS[1983/41]
Examination procedure26.04.1983Examination requested  [1983/41]
16.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.04.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
07.11.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.1987Fee for grant paid
30.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.03.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4148046  (HENDRICKSON THOMAS E, et al)
 [A]  - IEEE SPECTRUM, vol. 18, no. 1, January 1981, pages 64-65, New York, USA "Advances in extending performance of power MOS field-effect transistors promise to extend their usefulness..."