Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0098437

EP0098437 - Electronic locking device with key and lock parts interacting by means of electric pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.1988
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.07.1988 [1988/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH. & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
D-5620 Velbert 1 / DE
[1984/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Stellberger, Karl-Heinz
Jacob-Lüneschloss-Strasse 8
D-5620 Velbert 15 / DE
[1984/03]
Representative(s)Mentzel, Norbert , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse
Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel
Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig
Postfach 20 14 62
42214 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/03]Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Postfach 20 14 62
D-42214 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date83105968.818.06.1983
[1984/03]
Priority number, dateDE1982322575409.07.1982         Original published format: DE 3225754
[1984/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0098437
Date:18.01.1984
Language:DE
[1984/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0098437
Date:23.01.1985
Language:DE
[1985/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0098437
Date:05.08.1987
Language:DE
[1987/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1984
ClassificationInternational:E05B49/00, G07F7/08
[1984/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/32]
Former [1984/03]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Schliesseinrichtung mit über elektrische Impulse miteinander in Wechselwirkung tretenden, schlüsselartigen und schlossartigen Teilen[1984/03]
English:Electronic locking device with key and lock parts interacting by means of electric pulses[1984/03]
French:Dispositif de fermeture électronique avec action réciproque par l'intermédiaire d'impulsions électriques, des sous-ensembles formant clé et serrure[1984/03]
Examination procedure04.12.1984Examination requested  [1985/08]
11.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
27.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.1987Fee for grant paid
24.03.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US3944976  (FRANCE RODE);
 [A]EP0028965  (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]);
 [A]EP0029894  (IBM [US]);
 [A]US3859634  (PERRON ROBERT R, et al);
 [A]DE2614507  (DROESEL HERMANN DIPL MATH)