blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0101580

EP0101580 - Capacitance-type material level indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.1987
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berwind Corporation
1500 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
[1984/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Brenton, Ronald G.
626 St. James
Marysville, MI 48040 / US
02 / Runck, Robin B.
Guardian California 4030 Spencer Street
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
03 / Fathauer, George H.
1550 N. Belair
Mesa, AZ / US
04 / Hood, Charles F.
812 S. Wilbur Circle
Mesa, AZ / US
05 / Fleckenstein, Phillip P.
514 14th Street
Port Huron, MI 48060 / US
[1986/52]
Former [1984/12]01 / Brenton, Ronald G.
626 St. James
Marysville, MI 48040 / US
02 / Runck, Robin B.
Guardian California 4030 Spencer Street
Sherman Oaks, CA 91423 / US
03 / Fathauer, George H.
1550 N. Belair
Mesa, AZ / US
04 / Hood, Charles F.
812 S. Wilbur Circle
Mesa, AZ / US
05 / Fleckenstein, Phillip P.
514 14th Street
Port Huron, MI 48060 / US
Former [1984/09]01 / Brenton, Ronald G.
626 St. James
Marysville, MI 48040 / US
02 / Runck, Robin B.
4265 Fulton Avenue, Apt. Nr. 1
Sherman Oaks, CA 91423 / US
03 / Fathauer, George H.
1550 N. Belair
Mesa, AZ / US
04 / Hood, Charles F.
812 S. Wilbur Circle
Mesa, AZ / US
05 / Fleckenstein, Phillip P.
514 14th Street
Port Huron, MI 48060 / US
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Schwanthalerstrasse 106
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schwanthalerstrasse 106
80339 München / DE
Former [1984/09]Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring
Mozartstrasse 23
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date83107519.729.07.1983
[1984/09]
Priority number, dateUS1982041152425.08.1982         Original published format: US 411524
US1982041152525.08.1982         Original published format: US 411525
US1982041152725.08.1982         Original published format: US 411527
US1982041977620.09.1982         Original published format: US 419776
[1984/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0101580
Date:29.02.1984
Language:EN
[1984/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0101580
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1983
ClassificationIPC:G01F23/26
[1984/09]
CPC:
G01F23/266 (EP); G01F23/268 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1984/09]
TitleGerman:Kapazitiver Materialstandindikator[1984/09]
English:Capacitance-type material level indicator[1984/09]
French:Indicateur capacitif de niveau de matière[1984/09]
Examination procedure15.05.1984Examination requested  [1984/30]
20.06.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
07.07.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.1986Fee for grant paid
16.10.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS4164146  [ ];
 EP0044434  [ ];
 US4222267  [ ];
 DE3029352  [ ];
 DE2744864  [ ];
 GB1549649  [ ]
ExaminationUS3391547
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.