Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0105175 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0105175



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 285
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
17.05.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
13.05.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.05.1993 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.04.1993 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
21.04.1993 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
21.04.1993 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
20.01.1993 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
20.01.1993 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
20.01.1993 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
20.01.1993 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
13.01.1993 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.09.1992 Claims Appeal 1
29.09.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.09.1992 Description Appeal 1
29.09.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
29.09.1992 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
29.09.1992 Title page: Decision (inter partes / rejection of opposition) Appeal 15
22.08.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.08.1992 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.08.1992 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.08.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
07.08.1992 Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) Appeal 1
18.05.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.04.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
14.04.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.04.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
13.03.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.01.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
17.10.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.10.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.09.1991 Drawings Appeal 1
30.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
31.07.1991 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.07.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.07.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.07.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.07.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.07.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
08.07.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.07.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
05.06.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.06.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.06.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.06.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.05.1991 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
31.05.1991 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
31.05.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
31.05.1991 Means of redress Opposition 1
14.05.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.11.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.10.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
14.09.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Opposition 1
08.09.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 1
14.07.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
07.07.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
23.05.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Opposition 1
12.05.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.01.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.01.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Authorisation Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.11.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.11.1988 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Authorisation Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.10.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.12.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.10.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.10.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.10.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.07.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
01.04.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
24.03.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.02.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
20.01.1987 Authorisation Search / examination 1
20.01.1987 Request for assignment Search / examination 7
06.11.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.11.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
28.10.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.10.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.09.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.07.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.06.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.03.1986 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 3
10.03.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
10.03.1986 Description Search / examination 5
10.03.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
10.03.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
10.03.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.01.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.01.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
15.02.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.01.1984 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.01.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.01.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
24.08.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.08.1983 Authorisation Search / examination 1
24.08.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
24.08.1983 Description Search / examination 9
24.08.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.08.1983 Drawings Search / examination 2
24.08.1983 Priority document Search / examination 15
24.08.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10