blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0103291

EP0103291 - Boring and countersinking head and tool for boring and countersinking placed in it, and method of boring and countersinking a work piece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.1987
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KADIA-Diamant Maschinen- und Werkzeugfabrik O. Kopp GmbH & Co.
Fabrikstrasse 2
D-72622 Nürtingen / DE
[1984/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Duffner, August
Ölberg 9
D-7745 Schonach / DE
[1984/12]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/12]Dreiss, Hosenthien, Fuhlendorf & Partner
Gerokstrasse 6
D-70188 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date83108958.610.09.1983
[1984/12]
Priority number, dateDE19820025992U15.09.1982         Original published format: DE 8225992 U
[1984/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0103291
Date:21.03.1984
Language:DE
[1984/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0103291
Date:03.09.1986
Language:DE
[1986/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.1984
ClassificationIPC:B23B51/10, B23B31/04
[1984/12]
CPC:
B23B51/102 (EP,US); B23B31/026 (EP,US); Y10S408/714 (EP,US);
Y10T279/13 (EP,US); Y10T408/33 (EP,US); Y10T408/34 (EP,US);
Y10T408/906 (EP,US); Y10T408/94 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/12]
TitleGerman:Bohr- und Entgratkopf und darin einspannbares Bohr- und Entgratwerkzeug und Verfahren zum Bohren und Entgraten eines Werkstücks[1984/12]
English:Boring and countersinking head and tool for boring and countersinking placed in it, and method of boring and countersinking a work piece[1984/12]
French:Tête à forer et à chanfreiner et outil à forer et à chanfreiner serré à l'intérieur et méthode à forer et à chanfreiner une pièce[1984/12]
Examination procedure25.07.1984Examination requested  [1984/40]
10.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.02.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.1986Fee for grant paid
24.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE03.09.1986
NL03.09.1986
AT10.09.1986
LU30.09.1986
SE30.09.1986
[1999/52]
Former [1989/16]BE03.09.1986
NL03.09.1986
AT10.09.1986
SE30.09.1986
Former [1989/13]BE03.09.1986
NL03.09.1986
AT10.09.1986
Former [1988/36]BE03.09.1986
NL03.09.1986
Former [1988/04]BE03.09.1986
Documents cited:Search[A]US1308681  (PRIDEAUX CLARENCE BRADSHAW [GB]);
 [X]US1471866  (SIMPSON ALBERT E);
 [A]US2764767  (JOSEPH ADLAF WILLIAM);
 [E]EP0075061  (TRYCKLUFTTEKNIK HARALD NEUMANN [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.