Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0103846


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.07.2007 Change - inventor published on  08.08.2007  [2007/32]
12.02.1985 Withdrawal of application published on  17.04.1985 [1985/16]
13.06.1984 Request for examination filed published on  15.08.1984 [1984/33]
05.03.1984 Change - classification published on  09.05.1984 [1984/19]
05.03.1984 Change - classification published on  09.05.1984 [1984/19]
29.02.1984 Publication of search report published on  02.05.1984 [1984/18]
28.01.1984 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.03.1984 [1984/13]