blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0103846

EP0103846 - Automatic document feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.1985
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/13]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee
D-51373 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Massengeil, Hans-Adolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Geiselgasteigstrasse 46
D-8000 München 90 / DE
02 / Steinlehner, Friedrich-K.
Am Blankstadl 4
D-8000 München 90 / DE
03 / Büchele, Albert
Greinerberg 9
D-8000 München 70 / DE
04 / Ganz, Alfred
Zweigstrasse 20
D-8031 Gröbenzell / DE
[1984/13]
Application number, filing date83109050.114.09.1983
[1984/13]
Priority number, dateDE1982323491221.09.1982         Original published format: DE 3234912
DE1983331570829.04.1983         Original published format: DE 3315708
[1984/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0103846
Date:28.03.1984
Language:DE
[1984/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0103846
Date:02.05.1984
Language:DE
[1984/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.02.1984
ClassificationIPC:G03B27/46, G03B27/00
[1984/19]
CPC:
G03B27/625 (EP)
Former IPC [1984/13]G03B27/00
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   NL [1984/13]
TitleGerman:Selbsttätiger Vorlagenanleger[1984/13]
English:Automatic document feeder[1984/13]
French:Margeur automatique pour les documents[1984/13]
File destroyed:13.07.1991
Examination procedure01.06.1984Examination requested  [1984/33]
23.01.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.1985Application withdrawn by applicant  [1985/16]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchGB2032396  [ ];
 DE2460992  [ ];
 DE2815174  [ ];
 FR2255238  [ ];
 GB1495830  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.