blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0111774

EP0111774 - Method of manufacturing a minimum bird's beak recessed oxide isolation structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.1988
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.07.1988 [1988/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fabricius, Karen Ann
51 Wintergreen Avenue
Newburgh New York 12550 / US
02 / Kemlage, Bernard Michael
Ulster Landing Road Rt. 1, Box 344A
Kingston New York 12401 / US
[1984/26]
Representative(s)Mönig, Anton
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date83111758.524.11.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateUS1982045088320.12.1982         Original published format: US 450883
[1984/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0111774
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0111774
Date:05.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.1984
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/76, H01L21/32
[1984/26]
CPC:
H01L21/76205 (EP,US); H01L21/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Isolationsstruktur aus eingelassenem Oxid mit minimalem Vogelschnabel[1984/26]
English:Method of manufacturing a minimum bird's beak recessed oxide isolation structure[1984/26]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une structure d'isolation d'oxyde encastrée, à bec d'oiseau minimal[1984/26]
Examination procedure29.10.1984Examination requested  [1985/02]
11.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.1987Fee for grant paid
11.02.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3900350  (APPELS JOHANNES ARNOLDUS, et al)
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 9, February 1982, New York B.M. KEMLAGE et al. "Fabrication of oxide isolation using an oxynitride/polysilicon mask", page 4756
ExaminationJPS547882
 EP0046501
 EP0051534
    - Patent Abstracts of Japan, 1979 p. 34E97
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.