Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0114976

EP0114976 - Contact pin and process and device for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  12.08.1993
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIMET GmbH
Aggensteinstrasse 10
D-87669 Rieden / DE
[1984/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Kolb, Rudi
Fischerbichl 23
D-8958 Füssen-Hopfen / DE
[1984/32]
Representative(s)Hübner, Hans-Joachim
Vonnemann, Kloiber, Lewald, Hübner Edison Strasse 2
87437 Kempten / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/32]Hübner, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Mozartstrasse 31
D-87435 Kempten / DE
Application number, filing date83111986.230.11.1983
[1984/32]
Priority number, dateDE1982324825628.12.1982         Original published format: DE 3248256
[1984/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0114976
Date:08.08.1984
Language:DE
[1984/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0114976
Date:21.01.1987
Language:DE
[1987/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0114976
Date:06.07.1988
Language:DE
[1988/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.1986
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/04, H01R43/00
[1984/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1984/32]
TitleGerman:Kontaktstift und Verfahren sowie Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung[1984/32]
English:Contact pin and process and device for its manufacture[1984/32]
French:Broche de contact et procédé ainsi que dispositif pour sa fabrication[1984/32]
Examination procedure09.01.1987Examination requested  [1987/12]
18.12.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.01.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.1988Fee for grant paid
03.03.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.04.1989  18.07.1989  ADMISSIBLE
HARTING ELEKTRONIK GmbH
Postfach 1140
D-32325 Espelkamp / DE
Opponent's representative
Busse & Busse
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1989/22]
Opponent(s)01  06.04.1989  18.07.1989  ADMISSIBLE
HARTING ELEKTRONIK GmbH
Postfach 1140
D-32325 Espelkamp / DE
Opponent's representative
Busse & Busse Patentanwälte
Postfach 12 26
D-49002 Osnabrück / DE
10.05.1989No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
18.07.1989No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
20.07.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.08.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.08.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
23.12.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
17.10.1991Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
02.08.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/39]
Appeal following opposition14.12.1991Appeal received No.  T0972/91
26.02.1992Statement of grounds filed
30.07.1992Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1992/31]
28.01.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/05]
12.07.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
26.05.1993Date of oral proceedings
28.05.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE1589820  (GEN ELECTRIC);
 [A]US4057315  (MILLER NORMAN JAY, et al)