Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0114976 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0114976



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 219
12.08.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
23.07.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.07.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.05.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.05.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.03.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
09.03.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.03.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.03.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
15.02.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
15.02.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 3
03.02.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.1993 Drawings Appeal 1
28.01.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
16.12.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
16.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
14.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.07.1992 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 7
30.07.1992 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
29.06.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
04.03.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
03.03.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.02.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
01.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.01.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.01.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.01.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.01.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.01.1992 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.01.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
19.12.1991 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
14.12.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.12.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.10.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.10.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
17.10.1991 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
17.10.1991 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
17.10.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
17.10.1991 Means of redress Opposition 1
17.10.1991 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
17.10.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.02.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.02.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.02.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.02.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.02.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
12.02.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
12.02.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.01.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.01.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.01.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.1990 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.09.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.08.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
18.07.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.05.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
04.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
23.11.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.11.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.11.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.08.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
22.08.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.08.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
08.08.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
20.07.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.07.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.07.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
11.07.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.05.1989 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
18.04.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.04.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
10.04.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
06.04.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
27.05.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.03.1988 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.03.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.03.1988 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.01.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
23.12.1987 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.12.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.12.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
10.12.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.01.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
27.01.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
09.01.1987 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
04.12.1986 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.1986 European search report Search / examination 2
08.07.1986 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.06.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1