Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0146645

EP0146645 - Testing and diagnostic device for a digital calculator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.1988
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.09.1988 [1988/36]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Pascalstrasse 100
D-70569 Stuttgart / DE
For:FR  GB 
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/27]For:DE 
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Pascalstrasse 100
D-70569 Stuttgart / DE
For:FR  GB 
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Blum, Arnold
Finkenweg 16
D-7621 Gechingen / DE
[1985/27]
Representative(s)Jost, Ottokarl
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100
W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/27]Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100
W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
Application number, filing date83112339.308.12.1983
[1985/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0146645
Date:03.07.1985
Language:DE
[1985/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0146645
Date:16.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1984
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/26, H03M9/00, G11C19/00
[1987/38]
Former International [1985/27]G06F11/26, H03M9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1985/27]
TitleGerman:Prüf- und Diagnoseeinrichtung für Digitalrechner[1985/27]
English:Testing and diagnostic device for a digital calculator[1985/27]
French:Dispositif de test et de diagnostic pour calculatrice numérique[1985/27]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure14.12.1984Examination requested  [1985/27]
18.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.03.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.1987Fee for grant paid
27.03.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.06.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4322812  ;
 [A]US4183461  ;
 [A]DE2625183  ;
 [A]US3760382