blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0111837

EP0111837 - Method of x-ray imaging using slit scanning with controlled target erase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.1987
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [1984/26]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady New York 12305 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rieke, Richard James
19255 Benington Drive
Brookfield Wisconsin 53005 / US
[1984/26]
Representative(s)Schüler, Horst, et al
Kaiserstrasse 69
D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al
Kaiserstrasse 69
D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE
Application number, filing date83112340.108.12.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateUS1982045058917.12.1982         Original published format: US 450589
[1984/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0111837
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0111837
Date:19.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.1985
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/32, H05G1/64
[1984/26]
CPC:
H05G1/64 (EP,US); H05G1/60 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Röntgenbildern mit Schlitzabtastung und gesteuerter Targetlöschung einer Fernsehkamera[1984/26]
English:Method of x-ray imaging using slit scanning with controlled target erase[1984/26]
French:Procédé pour la production d'images de rayons X utilisant le balayage d'un diaphragme à fente avec contrôle d'éffacement de la cible du tube de prise de vue[1984/26]
File destroyed:30.04.1993
Examination procedure09.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/24]
17.03.1987Application withdrawn by applicant  [1987/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2485318  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]US4161755  (HAENDLE JOERG [DE], et al);
 [A]DE3019855  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]US2922842  (HERGENROTHER RUDOLF C);
 [A]GB1473689  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]EP0007105  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.