Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0111867 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0111867



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 618
30.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
06.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
21.12.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.12.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.12.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
31.08.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
31.08.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
31.08.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
31.08.1995 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.08.1995 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
11.08.1995 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.08.1995 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
09.05.1995 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
09.05.1995 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
02.05.1995 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
27.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.12.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.12.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.12.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.12.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.11.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 22
25.11.1994 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
23.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.1994 Claims Appeal 2
27.10.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.07.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.07.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.07.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.07.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.07.1994 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.07.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.1994 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.07.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
19.07.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
19.07.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
19.07.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
19.07.1994 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
13.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.07.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.03.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.03.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.03.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
04.11.1992 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
26.10.1992 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
26.10.1992 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.10.1992 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 2
07.10.1992 Request for assignment Appeal 1
25.09.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
17.07.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.06.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.05.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.05.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.05.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.04.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
01.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.04.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.03.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.01.1992 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
07.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.12.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.12.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.12.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.12.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.12.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
10.12.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
07.12.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.12.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.12.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.12.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
03.12.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.12.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.12.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
02.12.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.11.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.11.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.11.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.11.1991 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.10.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.10.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.10.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.09.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.09.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
16.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.08.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
12.08.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 14
12.08.1991 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.1991 Means of redress Opposition 1
12.08.1991 Text intended for grant Opposition 7
03.05.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.05.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.05.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.04.1991 Description Opposition 4
15.04.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
18.02.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
18.02.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.01.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.01.1991 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 5
04.01.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.01.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.01.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
02.01.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
29.12.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.12.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.12.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.12.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.11.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.11.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.11.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.11.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.11.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.11.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.11.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.11.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.11.1990 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.10.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
07.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
06.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.08.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
23.07.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.07.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.07.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.07.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.07.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.07.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.06.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.06.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.06.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.06.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
27.06.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.06.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
27.06.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
15.06.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.06.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.06.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.06.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.05.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.05.1990 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.1990 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
31.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.01.1990 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
10.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.1990 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
21.12.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.12.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
19.12.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
11.12.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.10.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
16.10.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
16.10.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
19.09.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
09.05.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.05.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.05.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.05.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
25.04.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
18.04.1989 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
18.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.04.1989 N/A Opposition 1
18.04.1989 N/A Opposition 1
18.04.1989 N/A Opposition 1
02.04.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
02.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.03.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.03.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.03.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.03.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.02.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.02.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.02.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.02.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
23.02.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.02.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.02.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
20.09.1988 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Search / examination 1
14.07.1988 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.07.1988 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.05.1988 Annex Search / examination 1
31.05.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.05.1988 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Search / examination 1
21.04.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.04.1988 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
19.04.1988 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.04.1988 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 4
23.02.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.02.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.02.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.11.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
16.11.1987 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.10.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
11.09.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
23.07.1987 Claims Search / examination 2
23.07.1987 Description Search / examination 8
23.07.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.03.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.11.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.11.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.11.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.10.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.05.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.02.1986 Claims Search / examination 1
24.02.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.01.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.08.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.10.1984 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.07.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.05.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.05.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
07.05.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.12.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.12.1983 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
12.12.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
12.12.1983 Description Search / examination 7
12.12.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.1983 Drawings Search / examination 2
12.12.1983 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.12.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.12.1983 Priority document Search / examination 11
12.12.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10