blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0111341


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.07.2007 Change - inventor published on  08.08.2007  [2007/32]
05.01.1989 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  22.02.1989 [1989/08]
15.12.1986 First examination report
16.07.1986 Change - representative published on  03.09.1986 [1986/36]
10.12.1984 Request for examination filed published on  13.02.1985 [1985/07]
21.05.1984 Publication of search report published on  25.07.1984 [1984/30]
19.04.1984 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.06.1984 [1984/25]