blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0111341
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0111341Global Dossier 25.07.1984A3
EP0111341 20.06.1984A2
Priority number Date
JP21881782 13.12.1982
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPS59108002 22.06.1984A
Priority number Date
JP21881782 13.12.1982