blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0111341

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
IT 
NL 
Examination procedure02.09.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1989/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:20.06.1984 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:25.07.1984 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:13.02.1985 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19841128
 
Event date:04.02.1987 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19861217
 
Event date:22.02.1989 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:19880726
 
Event date:08.08.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:BABA, KAZUO
 
Event date:08.08.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MASHITA, KENTARO
 
Event date:08.08.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:KAWAMATA, SYOZO
 
Event date:08.08.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:KATAO, MASAAKI
 
Event date:08.08.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:KAWAI, YOSHIO