Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0111341

EP0111341 - Process for producing a vinyl polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.1989
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1984/25]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
Kitahama 4-chome 5-33
Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Baba, Kazuo
4-12, Aobadai-5-chome
Ichihara-shi / JP
02 / Mashita, Kentaro
9-3, Aobadai-4-chome
Ichihara-shi / JP
03 / Kawamata, Syozo
1114-8, Anegasaki
Ichihara-shi / JP
04 / Katao, Masaaki
135, Iriyamazu
Ichihara-shi / JP
05 / Kawai, Yoshio
9, Yushudainishi-1-chome
Ichihara-shi / JP
[1984/25]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/25]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date83112500.012.12.1983
[1984/25]
Priority number, dateJP1982021881713.12.1982         Original published format: JP 21881782
[1984/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0111341
Date:20.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0111341
Date:25.07.1984
Language:EN
[1984/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.1984
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/00, B01J19/00, // (C08F2/00, 10:00)
[1984/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1984/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines vinylischen Polymers[1984/25]
English:Process for producing a vinyl polymer[1984/25]
French:Procédé pour produire un polymère vinylique[1984/25]
File destroyed:13.07.1995
Examination procedure28.11.1984Examination requested  [1985/07]
17.12.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1989/08]
02.09.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1989/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2356197  (ICI LTD [GB]);
 [A]GB876409  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO);
 [A]DE1283197  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG)