Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0116157

EP0116157 - Coaxial plug and socket device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.1987
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.09.1987 [1987/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1984/34]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Acke, Edgar, Ing. grad.
Splethagestrasse 41
B-8020 Oostkamp / BE
[1984/34]
Application number, filing date83112783.219.12.1983
[1984/34]
Priority number, dateDE19820035915U21.12.1982         Original published format: DE 8235915 U
[1984/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0116157
Date:22.08.1984
Language:DE
[1984/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0116157
Date:08.10.1986
Language:DE
[1986/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.1984
ClassificationInternational:H01R17/12
[1984/34]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1984/34]
TitleGerman:Koaxialsteckvorrichtung[1984/34]
English:Coaxial plug and socket device[1984/34]
French:Dispositif de connexion coaxiale[1984/34]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure25.09.1984Examination requested  [1984/48]
02.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.11.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
01.04.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.1986Fee for grant paid
07.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US4012105  ;
 [A]DE1923956U  ;
 [A]DE1951180U  ;
 [AD]DE1805039  ;
 [AD]DE1813161