Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0116157

Designated contracting states CH 
 DE 
FR 
GB 
 LI 
Examination procedure07.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted08.10.1986
Opposition procedure09.07.1987No opposition filed within time limit published on 23.09.1987 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.08.1984 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB LI
 
Event date:28.11.1984 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19840925
 
Event date:08.10.1986 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB LI
 
Event date:13.11.1986 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3366779
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19861113
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:12.12.1986 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:23.09.1987 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:22.11.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:19931122
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:23.12.1993 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19931223
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:21.03.1994 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:19940321
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:19.12.1994 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Effective DATE:19941219
 
Event date:31.12.1994 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Effective DATE:19941231
 
Event date:31.12.1994 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Effective DATE:19941231
 
Event date:17.02.1995 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19950217
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:16.08.1995 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:19941219
 
Event date:31.08.1995 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Effective DATE:19950831
 
Event date:31.08.1995 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:27.10.1995 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:03.09.1996 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Effective DATE:19960903