blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0083949

EP0083949 - Thermoplastic propylene block copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.1988
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.1989Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.05.1989 [1989/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STAMICARBON B.V.
Mijnweg 1
NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL
[1983/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Loontjens, Jacobus Antonius
Synagogeplantsoen 76
NL-6231 KK Meerssen / NL
[1983/29]
Representative(s)Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al
DSM Patents & Trademarks
Office Geleen
Postbus 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1983/29]Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al
OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
Application number, filing date83200011.106.01.1983
[1983/29]
Priority number, dateNL1982000004908.01.1982         Original published format: NL 8200049
[1983/29]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0083949
Date:20.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0083949
Date:06.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1983
ClassificationIPC:C08F297/06
[1983/29]
CPC:
C08F297/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1983/29]
TitleGerman:Thermoplastisches Propylen-Block-Copolymer[1983/29]
English:Thermoplastic propylene block copolymer[1983/29]
French:Copolymère bloc thermoplastique de propylène[1983/29]
Examination procedure13.12.1983Examination requested  [1984/08]
16.01.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.12.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.10.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.1986Fee for grant paid
23.12.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.02.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE31.05.1987
[1989/18]
Documents cited:SearchJPS4419542B  [ ] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.);
 JPS4420751B  [ ] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS CO., LTD.);
 [A]FR1358708  (GRACE W R & CO);
 [A]FR2314202  (SOLVAY [BE])
 [XD]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19691215), vol. 71, no. 24, Database accession no. 113670C, page 38
 [AD]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19691229), vol. 71, no. 13, Database accession no. 125417P
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.