blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0098650

EP0098650 - Electrical connector with a release member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.1987
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.11.1987 [1987/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1984/03]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Moors, Johannes Henricus
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1984/03]
Representative(s)Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1984/03]Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date83200965.829.06.1983
[1984/03]
Priority number, dateNL1982000266802.07.1982         Original published format: NL 8202668
[1984/03]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0098650
Date:18.01.1984
Language:EN
[1984/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0098650
Date:20.11.1986
Language:EN
[1986/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1983
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/115
[1984/03]
CPC:
H01R13/115 (EP,US); H01R13/20 (EP,US); H01R13/35 (EP,US);
H01R43/16 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1984/03]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder mit einem Entriegelungselement[1984/03]
English:Electrical connector with a release member[1984/03]
French:Connecteur électrique avec un moyen de déverrouillage[1984/03]
Examination procedure08.02.1984Examination requested  [1984/17]
25.01.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.08.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.01.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.1986Fee for grant paid
18.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.198604   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.1986
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0043655  (AMP INC [US]);
 [A]US3550069  (TEAGNO WLADIMIRO, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.