blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0111976

EP0111976 - Zwitterionic compounds having clay soil removal/anti-redeposition properties useful in detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.1991
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.1991 [1991/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
301 East Sixth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
301 East Sixth Street
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rubingh, Donn Nelton
8224 Sheed Road
Cincinnati Ohio 45239 / US
02 / Gosselink, Eugene Paul
3754 Susanna Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45239 / US
[1984/26]
Representative(s)Ernst, Hubert, et al
PROCTER & GAMBLE
EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]Ernst, Hubert, et al
PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100
B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date83201777.614.12.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateUS1982045255623.12.1982         Original published format: US 452556
[1984/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0111976
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0111976
Date:02.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0111976
Date:11.04.1990
Language:EN
[1990/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.1987
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/00, C11D3/30, C11D3/37, C11D1/44
[1987/36]
CPC:
C08G65/3344 (EP); C08G65/2624 (EP); C08G65/263 (EP);
C11D1/88 (EP); C11D1/90 (EP); C11D1/92 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1987/36]C11D3/00, C11D1/88, C11D3/37, C11D1/44
Former IPC [1984/26]C11D3/37, C11D1/88
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Zwitterionische Verbindungen mit Fleckenentfernungs- und Antiwiederabsetzeigenschaften, verwendbar in Detergenszusammensetzungen[1984/26]
English:Zwitterionic compounds having clay soil removal/anti-redeposition properties useful in detergent compositions[1984/26]
French:Composés zwittérioniques ayant des propriétés pour enlever des taches et la contre-redéposition utilisables dans des compositions détergentes[1984/26]
Examination procedure19.02.1988Examination requested  [1988/16]
15.06.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.10.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1989Fee for grant paid
22.12.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2226871  (HENKEL & CIE GMBH);
 [A]US4075130  (NAYLOR CARTER G, et al);
 [AD]US4171278  (ANDREE HANS [DE], et al);
 [A]US4172887  (GROLLIER JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al);
 [A]FR2435966  (CECA SA);
 [A]EP0042187  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.