blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0087306

EP0087306 - Packaging boxes or cartons [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.06.1989
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOBAR VENDABEKA LIMITED
Wylds Road Bridgwater
Somerset / GB
For all designated states
AUTOBAR VENDABEKA LIMITED
Wylds Road Bridgwater
Somerset / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/38]For all designated states
AUTOBAR VENDABEKA LIMITED
Wylds Road
Bridgwater Somerset / GB
For all designated states
AUTOBAR VENDABEKA LIMITED
Wylds Road
Bridgwater Somerset / GB
Former [1983/35]For all designated states
WILLIAM R. BROWN (PACKAGING) COMPANY LIMITED
"The Birches" Lower Broad Oak Road West Hill
Ottery St. Mary Devonshire / GB
For all designated states
AUTOBAR VENDABEKA LIMITED
Wylds Road
Bridgwater Somerset / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Brown, William Robert
The Birches Lower Broad Oak Road West Hill
Ottery St. Mary Devonshire / GB
02 / Caddy, Harold William
61 Stafford Road
Bridgewater Somerset / GB
[1983/35]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert, et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/35]Warren, Anthony Robert, et al
BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date83300891.521.02.1983
[1983/35]
Priority number, dateGB1982000490319.02.1982         Original published format: GB 8204903
[1983/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0087306
Date:31.08.1983
Language:EN
[1983/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0087306
Date:15.08.1984
Language:EN
[1984/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0087306
Date:19.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.1984
ClassificationIPC:B65D85/32
[1983/35]
CPC:
B65D85/324 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/35]
TitleGerman:Verpackungskartons oder -dosen[1983/35]
English:Packaging boxes or cartons[1983/35]
French:Boîtes ou cartons d'emballage[1983/35]
Examination procedure28.12.1984Examination requested  [1985/12]
03.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.02.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.1987Fee for grant paid
15.05.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.05.1988  31.05.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Valleteau, Christian
95, Boulevard Malesherbes
F-75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Brycman, Jean, et al, et al
CABINET ORES 6, Avenue de Messine
F-75008 Paris / FR
 [1988/28]
13.07.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.02.1989Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.02.1989Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.08.1987
BE19.08.1987
FR19.08.1987
IT19.08.1987
NL19.08.1987
SE31.08.1987
[2005/49]
Former [1999/42]AT19.08.1987
BE19.08.1987
CH19.08.1987
IT19.08.1987
LI19.08.1987
NL19.08.1987
SE31.08.1987
Former [1989/24]AT19.08.1987
BE19.08.1987
CH19.08.1987
LI19.08.1987
NL19.08.1987
SE31.08.1987
Former [1989/19]AT19.08.1987
BE19.08.1987
NL19.08.1987
SE31.08.1987
Former [1989/13]AT19.08.1987
BE19.08.1987
NL19.08.1987
Former [1989/05]BE19.08.1987
NL19.08.1987
Former [1989/03]BE19.08.1987
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3531044  (BAKER THEODORE C);
 [A]FR2318081  (METAL BOX CO LTD [GB]);
 [XD]GB2072628  (HINTEREGGER P);
 [AP]EP0059024  (BROWN PACKAGING W R [GB], et al)
ExaminationEP0079757
 EP0085559
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.