blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0090583

EP0090583 - Heat treatment of aluminium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.12.1991
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal
Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1983/40]For all designated states
ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
1188 Sherbrooke Street West
Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Field, David John
"The Breach Farm"
Teanford Tean Staffordshire / GB
[1983/40]
Representative(s)Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins
1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/50]Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Former [1983/40]Hewlett, Arthur James
STEVENS, HEWLETT & PERKINS 5 Quality Court Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1HZ / GB
Application number, filing date83301598.522.03.1983
[1983/40]
Priority number, dateGB1982000949231.03.1982         Original published format: GB 8209492
[1983/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0090583
Date:05.10.1983
Language:EN
[1983/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0090583
Date:10.10.1984
Language:EN
[1984/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0090583
Date:27.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/35]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0090583
Date:05.02.1992
Language:EN
[1992/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.1984
ClassificationIPC:C22F1/04, C22C21/00, C22C21/06, C22C21/12
[1984/39]
CPC:
C22C21/06 (EP,US); C22C21/00 (EP,US); C22C21/12 (EP,US);
C22F1/05 (EP,US); C22F1/057 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1983/40]C22F1/04
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI [1983/40]
TitleGerman:Wärmebehandlung von Aluminiumlegierungen[1983/40]
English:Heat treatment of aluminium alloys[1983/40]
French:Traitement thermique d'alliages d'aluminium[1983/40]
Examination procedure14.12.1984Examination requested  [1985/10]
25.10.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.02.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.1986Fee for grant paid
02.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.05.1987  12.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
PECHINEY, S.A.
23 rue Balzac
F-75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Séraphin, Léon
PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette
69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [1987/29]
Opponent(s)01  20.05.1987  12.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
PECHINEY, S.A.
23 rue Balzac
F-75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Séraphin, Léon
PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel
F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
22.07.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.02.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
30.03.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
11.11.1988Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.06.1990Date of oral proceedings
27.06.1990Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
31.12.1990Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.05.1991Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.05.1991Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.08.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
03.09.1991Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.01.1989Appeal received No.  T0022/89
10.03.1989Statement of grounds filed
26.06.1990Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2278785  (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]);
 [Y]FR2385806  (ALUSUISSE [CH]);
 [Y]FR1220961  (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA);
 [A]US2381219  (LE BARON IRA M);
 [E]GB2115836  (SECR DEFENCE)
 [X]  - 7th INTERNATIONAL LIGHT METALS CONGRESS, PROCEEDINGS CONFERENCE, 22nd-26th June 1981, Leoben, Vienna, Austria, pages 50-51, Aluminium-Verlag GmbH, D}sseldorf, DE; A. GYSLER: "Correlation between microstructure and mechanical properties of Al-Li-x alloys"
 [A]  - METALLOVEDENIE I TERMICHESKAYA OBRABOTKA METALLOV, no. 6, June 1974, pages 4-8, Consultants Bureau, a division of Plenum Publishing Corp., New York, US; O.A. SETYUKOV et al.: "Structure and phase composition of VAD 23 ingots"
 [XP]  - NASA CONTRACTOR REPORT 3578, "The relative stress-corrosion-cracking susceptibility of candidate aluminum-lithium alloys for aerospace applications", P.P. PIZZO (Advanced research and applications corporation Sunnyvale, US), prepared for Ames Research Center under Contract NAS2-10365, NASA 1982;
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.