Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0091314

EP0091314 - Locking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.1987
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMAS FOX & COMPANY LIMITED
39 Hoxton Square
London, N1 / GB
[1983/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Rutter, Paul Edward
'Astrope Foley' Astrope
Puttenham, Near Tring, Hertfordshire / GB
[1983/41]
Representative(s)Jones, Graham Henry
Graham Jones & Company
77 Beaconsfield Road
Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/41]Jones, Graham H.
Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath
London SE3 7LG / GB
Application number, filing date83301909.405.04.1983
[1983/41]
Priority number, dateGB1982001019706.04.1982         Original published format: GB 8210197
[1983/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0091314
Date:12.10.1983
Language:EN
[1983/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0091314
Date:23.07.1986
Language:EN
[1986/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.1983
ClassificationInternational:E05B43/00, E05G1/04
[1983/41]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   IT,   SE [1983/41]
TitleGerman:Verschlussvorrichtung[1983/41]
English:Locking apparatus[1983/41]
French:Serrure[1983/41]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure24.01.1984Examination requested  [1984/15]
22.01.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.12.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.1986Fee for grant paid
17.01.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT23.07.1986
SE31.07.1986
[1999/42]
Former [1989/16]SE31.07.1986
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2211361  ;
 [X]DE2252985  ;
 [A]DE2808391  ;
 [A]DE7814258U