Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0097016 | ![]() | 11.10.1989 | B1 | EP0097016 | 11.09.1985 | A3 | EP0097016 | 28.12.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP10042282 | 11.06.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3380719D1 | 16.11.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP10042282 | 11.06.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH047087B | 07.02.1992 | B2 | JPS58218117 | 19.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10042282 | 11.06.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4585943 | 29.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10042282 | 11.06.1982 |