blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0102764

EP0102764 - Apparatus for testing sedimentation rates of liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.1988
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.08.1988 [1988/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIESSE DIAGNOSTICA SENESE s.r.l.
Via S.Vittore, 36/1
I-20123 Milano / IT
[1984/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Ricci, Antonio
Loc.Caggio 44 Riciano
Monteriggioni Siena / IT
02 / Romoli, Luciano
Via Svizzera 20
Firenze / IT
[1984/11]
Representative(s)Corin, Christopher John, et al
Mathisen Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham
Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/11]Corin, Christopher John, et al
Mathisen Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date83304524.805.08.1983
[1984/11]
Priority number, dateIT1982000948910.08.1982         Original published format: IT 948982
[1984/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0102764
Date:14.03.1984
Language:EN
[1984/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0102764
Date:19.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1983
ClassificationIPC:G01N15/04
[1984/11]
CPC:
G01N15/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/11]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Messung der Senkungsgeschwindigkeit von Flüssigkeiten[1984/11]
English:Apparatus for testing sedimentation rates of liquids[1984/11]
French:Dispositif de mesure de la vitesse de sédimentation des liquides[1984/11]
Examination procedure10.09.1984Examination requested  [1984/46]
26.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.1987Fee for grant paid
09.02.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.05.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE894925  (WALTER STEIN DR MED);
 [A]DE2418065  (HELLIGE GMBH);
 [A]FR2413661  (NANCY 1 UNIVERSITE [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.