Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0134849

EP0134849 - Treatment of zeolites [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.01.1992
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
150 East 42nd Street New York
New York 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/13]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
150 East 42nd Street
New York New York 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chang, Clarence Dayton
11 Murray Place
Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US
02 / Dessau, Ralph Moritz
14 Celler Road
Edison New Jersey 08817 / US
03 / Chu, Cynthia Ting-Wah
283 Wescott Boulevard
Pennington New Jersey 08534 / US
04 / Kerr, George Thomson
10 Pin Oak Drive
Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US
05 / Miale, Joseph Nicolas
25 Merritt Drive
Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US
[1985/13]
Representative(s)Carpmael, John William Maurice , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[1988/12]
Former [1985/13]Grundy, Derek George Ritchie
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date83304717.815.08.1983
[1985/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0134849
Date:27.03.1985
Language:EN
[1985/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0134849
Date:22.07.1987
Language:EN
[1987/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.1984
ClassificationInternational:B01J29/06
[1985/13]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1985/13]
TitleGerman:Behandlung von Zeoliten[1985/13]
English:Treatment of zeolites[1985/13]
French:Traitement de zéolites[1985/13]
Examination procedure02.09.1985Examination requested  [1985/46]
13.05.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
29.01.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.1987Fee for grant paid
12.02.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.1988  02.05.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang-
Postfach 13 45
D-63403 Hanau / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1988/23]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.1988  02.05.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Degussa AG, Frankfurt - Zweigniederlassung Wolfgang-
Postfach 13 45
D-63403 Hanau / DE
04.07.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.11.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.11.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
17.01.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
01.10.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
11.10.1991Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/12]
Appeal following opposition13.07.1989Appeal received No.  T0442/89
13.07.1989Statement of grounds filed
30.04.1991Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1990/27]BE31.08.1989
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2285176  ;
 [Y]US3013987  ;
 [YD]US3644220  ;
 [Y]US4302622  ;
 [Y]US3997474  ;
 [A]US4374296