Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0134849 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0134849



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 368
30.01.1992 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
30.01.1992 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
27.01.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
13.10.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.10.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.10.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.10.1991 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.10.1991 Means of redress Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Withdrawal of application Opposition 1
24.05.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.05.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.04.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 12
16.03.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
13.02.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.01.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.01.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.01.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
14.12.1989 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.12.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.1989 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
18.10.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
21.09.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.09.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.07.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.07.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.07.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.07.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
11.07.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.07.1989 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 1
07.07.1989 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 1
07.07.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
20.03.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.01.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 1
17.01.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
17.11.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
10.11.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
04.07.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.07.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.05.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
26.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.04.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
15.04.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.02.1988 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.02.1988 Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) Search / examination 1
05.08.1987 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
01.08.1987 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.06.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.04.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.04.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
01.04.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.01.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
09.10.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.10.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
12.09.1986 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
10.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 1
10.07.1986 Description Search / examination 3
10.07.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.05.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.05.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.04.1985 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.01.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.07.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
15.08.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.08.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
15.08.1983 Description Search / examination 29
15.08.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.08.1983 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.08.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
15.08.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
15.08.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 120
15.08.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
15.08.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
15.05.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
08.10.1981 Advice of delivery Opposition 2