blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0104751

EP0104751 - Photosensitive elastomeric polymer composition for flexographic printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.1993
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN.
Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/17]For all designated states
W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, New York 10036 / US
Former [1990/32]For all designated states
W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (a Connecticut corp.)
Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York New York 10036 / US
Former [1988/37]For all designated states
UNIROYAL PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. (under the laws of the state of New Jersey)
312 North Hill Street
Mishawaka, Indiana 46544 / US
Former [1984/14]For all designated states
UNIROYAL, INC.
1230 Avenue of the Americas Rockefeller Center
New York, New York 10020 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Worns, John R.
1436 Tremont Drive
Mishawaka St. Joseph Indiana 46544 / US
[1984/14]
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/10]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr., et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Former [1990/43]Geldard, David Guthrie
URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB
Former [1990/32]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr.
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Former [1984/14]Harrison, Michael Robert
URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Application number, filing date83304800.219.08.1983
[1984/14]
Priority number, dateUS1982041358131.08.1982         Original published format: US 413581
[1984/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0104751
Date:04.04.1984
Language:EN
[1984/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0104751
Date:05.09.1984
Language:EN
[1984/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0104751
Date:28.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1984
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/033, G03F7/038
[1992/44]
CPC:
G03F7/033 (EP)
Former IPC [1984/14]G03C1/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/14]
TitleGerman:Lichtempfindliche elastomere Kunststoffzusammensetzung für flexographische Druckplatten[1984/14]
English:Photosensitive elastomeric polymer composition for flexographic printing plates[1984/14]
French:Composition élastomère polymère photosensible pour plaques d'impression flexographiques[1984/14]
Examination procedure11.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/21]
10.10.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.09.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.03.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.1988Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.02.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.1992Fee for grant paid
28.04.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination21.02.1989Appeal received No.  T0305/89
10.04.1989Statement of grounds filed
17.11.1989Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1989/46]
11.01.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/02]
29.11.1990Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/48]
10.12.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/50]
18.02.1991Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1991/08]
30.03.1991Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1991/13]
11.07.1991Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)29.07.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42]
Request for further processing for:10.02.1988Request for further processing filed
10.02.1988Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.04.1988Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
04.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
18.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 08
08.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.198705   M06   Fee paid on   04.11.1987
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.10.1992
BE28.10.1992
CH28.10.1992
LI28.10.1992
NL28.10.1992
SE28.10.1992
[1994/18]
Former [1993/23]BE28.10.1992
CH28.10.1992
LI28.10.1992
NL28.10.1992
SE28.10.1992
Former [1993/21]BE28.10.1992
CH28.10.1992
LI28.10.1992
SE28.10.1992
Former [1993/19]CH28.10.1992
LI28.10.1992
SE28.10.1992
Former [1993/13]CH28.10.1992
LI28.10.1992
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1312492  (MCCALL CORP);
 [Y]GB1395822  (UNIROYAL INC);
 [X]GB2013216  (DU PONT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.