Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0104751 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0104751



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 277
01.09.1993 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.09.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.05.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.05.1992 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.05.1992 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.05.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 6
07.02.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
31.01.1992 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.09.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.09.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
03.09.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.07.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.07.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.03.1991 Claims Appeal 1
30.03.1991 Description Appeal 1
30.03.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.02.1991 Claims Appeal 1
18.02.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.01.1991 General authorisation Search / examination 1
21.01.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.01.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.12.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.12.1990 Claims Appeal 1
10.12.1990 Description Appeal 2
10.12.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.11.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.11.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.09.1990 Authorisation Search / examination 1
27.09.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.09.1990 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.09.1990 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 1
11.09.1990 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.09.1990 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 1
01.09.1990 Authorisation Search / examination 1
01.09.1990 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.08.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
23.08.1990 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 4
14.08.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.06.1990 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.06.1990 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.06.1990 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 1
13.03.1990 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
13.01.1990 Claims Appeal 1
13.01.1990 Description Appeal 2
11.01.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
17.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.11.1989 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 1
18.07.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
03.07.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
10.04.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.04.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
21.02.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.12.1988 Claims Search / examination 2
19.12.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.12.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
19.12.1988 Means of redress Search / examination 1
28.07.1988 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.07.1988 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.06.1988 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
18.04.1988 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.04.1988 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.03.1988 Claims Search / examination 2
15.03.1988 Description Search / examination 2
15.03.1988 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.1988 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
14.12.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.12.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.11.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.1987 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
16.09.1987 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.09.1987 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.09.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
23.09.1986 Description Search / examination 19
23.09.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.07.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.04.1986 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.03.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
01.03.1986 Description Search / examination 4
01.03.1986 Description Search / examination 3
01.03.1986 Description Search / examination 4
01.03.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.03.1985 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
14.09.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.07.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.07.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
15.02.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.10.1983 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
10.10.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
19.09.1983 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 3
19.08.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.08.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
19.08.1983 Description Search / examination 23
19.08.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.08.1983 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.08.1983 Priority document Search / examination 31
19.08.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10