Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0104060 | ![]() | 26.02.1986 | B1 | EP0104060 | 28.03.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41954582 | 17.09.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3362322D1 | 03.04.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US41954582 | 17.09.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6054970B | 03.12.1985 | B2 | JPS59135228 | 03.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US41954582 | 17.09.1982 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4397980 | 09.08.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US41954582 | 17.09.1982 |