blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0111996

EP0111996 - Improvements in and relating to the connection of optical fibres by fusion splicing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.02.1988
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.1988No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.1988 [1988/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2-12 Gresham Street
London EC2V 7AG / GB
[1984/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Marr, Donald
"Chantal" School Lane
Ufford Woodbridge Suffolk / GB
[1984/26]
Representative(s)Leng, Francis Edward, et al
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]Leng, Francis Edward, et al
British Telecom Intellectual Property Unit Room 1304 151 Gower Street
London WC1E 6BA / GB
Application number, filing date83305848.028.09.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateGB1982002887708.10.1982         Original published format: GB 8228877
[1984/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0111996
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0111996
Date:08.04.1987
Language:EN
[1987/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.1984
ClassificationIPC:C03B37/14, G02B6/24
[1987/15]
CPC:
G02B6/2551 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1984/26]C03B37/14, G02B7/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Anschluss von Lichtleitern durch Schmelzverbinden[1984/26]
English:Improvements in and relating to the connection of optical fibres by fusion splicing[1984/26]
French:Connexions de fibres optiques par fusion[1984/26]
Examination procedure17.07.1984Examination requested  [1984/39]
12.06.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
18.07.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.1986Fee for grant paid
17.10.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.01.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP57041606  ;
 [A]JP56011423  ;
 [A]JP54113348  ;
 [A]JP57042013  ;
 [A]FR2323646  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]GB2046466  (BICC LTD)
 [X]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 112(P-124)(990), 23rd June 1982, page 46P124 & JP - A - 57 041606 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 08-03-1982, & JP57041606 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 56(P-57)(728), 17th April 1981, page 138P57 & JP - A - 56 011423 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 04-02-1981, & JP56011423 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 135(E-150), 10th November 1979, page 129E150 & JP - A - 54 113 348 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 04-09-1979, & JP54113348 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 112(P-124)(990), 23rd June 1982, page 97P124 & JP - A - 57 042013 (DAINICHI NIPPON DENSEN K.K.) 09-03-1982, & JP57042013 A 00000000
 [A]  - DR. HANS JAHN: "Epoxidharze", 1968, pages 63-69, VEB, Deutscher Verlag für Grundstoffindustrie, Leipzig, DE.
 [A]  - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 216, April 1982, pages 131-132, no. 21643, Havant Hampshire, GB.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.