Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0106695

EP0106695 - Method of providing a surface effect in a release coating and a release paper product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.03.1992
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCOTT PAPER COMPANY
Industrial Highway Tinicum Island Road Tinicum Township
Delaware County, PA 19113 / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/17]For all designated states
SCOTT PAPER COMPANY
Industrial Highway Tinicum Island Road Tinicum Township
Delaware County, PA 19113 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gray, Lorin, S., III
39 Concord Street
Portland Maine 04103 / US
02 / Doody, Jeffrey Scott
19 Farnell Drive
Yarmouth Maine 04096 / US
[1984/17]
Representative(s)McCall, John Douglas , et al
WP Thompson
Coopers Building
Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]McCall, John Douglas , et al
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [1984/17]McCall, John Douglas , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date83306303.518.10.1983
[1984/17]
Priority number, dateUS1982043520919.10.1982         Original published format: US 435209
[1984/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0106695
Date:25.04.1984
Language:EN
[1984/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0106695
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0106695
Date:13.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.1984
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/06, B05D5/08, D21H5/02
[1984/17]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1984/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Versehen einer Trennschicht mit einem Oberflächeneffekt und ein Trennpapierprodukt[1984/17]
English:Method of providing a surface effect in a release coating and a release paper product[1984/17]
French:Méthode pour conférer un effet de surface à un revêtement pelable et un produit papetier pelable[1984/17]
Examination procedure11.10.1984Examination requested  [1984/51]
18.06.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.04.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.1986Fee for grant paid
12.07.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.1987  31.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Pöhlau, Claus
Patentanwälte
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz & Segeth
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1987/37]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.1987  31.07.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co.
Schwabacher Strasse 482
D-90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Pöhlau, Claus, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz& Segeth, Postfach 30 55
D-90014 Nürnberg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.11.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
18.03.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
27.06.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1989Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
10.01.1991Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.01.1991Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.01.1991Date of oral proceedings
15.01.1991Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.04.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.07.1991Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.02.1989Appeal received No.  T0125/89
14.04.1989Statement of grounds filed
10.01.1991Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4289821  ;
 [Y]US3918393  ;
 [Y]US3644161