Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0106695 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0106695



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 253
28.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.04.1992 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.04.1992 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
15.02.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
04.07.1991 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
04.07.1991 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.04.1991 Claims Opposition 2
03.04.1991 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
03.04.1991 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
03.04.1991 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
03.04.1991 Description Opposition 5
03.04.1991 Drawings Opposition 1
19.03.1991 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.03.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.03.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.12.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
29.11.1990 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
29.11.1990 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
26.11.1990 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.11.1990 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
26.11.1990 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
26.11.1990 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.11.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
19.11.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.11.1990 Request for oral proceedings Appeal 2
09.11.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.11.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
02.11.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.10.1990 Annex to a communication Appeal 3
31.10.1990 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
09.08.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.1990 Request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
17.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
04.04.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.1990 Request for oral proceedings Appeal 6
20.09.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
11.05.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.05.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.05.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.04.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.04.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
18.02.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.02.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.01.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.01.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.01.1989 Claims Opposition 1
30.01.1989 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
30.01.1989 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
30.01.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
30.01.1989 Means of redress Opposition 1
27.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.01.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.1988 Claims Opposition 1
19.12.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
19.12.1988 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
19.12.1988 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
18.11.1988 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
10.11.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
04.07.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.06.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
27.06.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
23.06.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
10.05.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
31.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.03.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
08.03.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
25.02.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
25.02.1988 Information concerning the posting of documents in due time Opposition 1
25.02.1988 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
02.11.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.11.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.07.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.07.1987 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
17.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.07.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.11.1986 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.07.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.07.1986 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.04.1986 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
22.01.1986 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.01.1986 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
03.12.1985 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.10.1985 Claims Search / examination 2
11.10.1985 Description Search / examination 2
11.10.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.06.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.10.1984 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
11.10.1984 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
11.10.1984 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
03.05.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.02.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.01.1984 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.01.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.01.1984 European search report Search / examination 3
18.10.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.10.1983 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.1983 Description Search / examination 13
18.10.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.10.1983 Drawings Search / examination 1
18.10.1983 Priority document Search / examination 21
18.10.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10