blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0112045

EP0112045 - Detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.1987
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.1989Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [1984/26]For all designated states
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Naik, Appaya Raghunath
8 Kilmalcolm Close
Oxton Birkenhead Merseyside / GB
[1984/26]
Representative(s)Thomas, Susan Margaret, et al
UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/22]Thomas, Susan Margaret, et al
UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [1985/46]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1984/26]Fransella, Mary Evelyn
Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date83306947.914.11.1983
[1984/26]
Priority number, dateGB1982003268716.11.1982         Original published format: GB 8232687
[1984/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0112045
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0112045
Date:21.01.1987
Language:EN
[1987/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1984
ClassificationIPC:C11D1/12, C11D3/02
[1984/26]
CPC:
C11D3/0094 (EP); C11D1/123 (EP); C11D3/046 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1984/26]
TitleGerman:Detergenszusammensetzungen[1984/26]
English:Detergent compositions[1984/26]
French:Compositions détergentes[1984/26]
Examination procedure22.08.1984Examination requested  [1984/45]
12.06.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.06.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.1986Fee for grant paid
29.07.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.01.1987
BE21.01.1987
[1989/12]
Former [1988/04]BE21.01.1987
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB1164854  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [A]DE2619668  (UNILEVER NV);
 [AP]EP0071410  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al);
 [AP]EP0071412  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.