blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0113216

EP0113216 - Digital analog converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.1990 [1990/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1984/28]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hino, Youzi c/o Fujitsu Limited
Patent Department 1015 Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1984/28]
Representative(s)Sunderland, James Harry, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/28]Sunderland, James Harry, et al
HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date83307559.113.12.1983
[1984/28]
Priority number, dateJP1982023390929.12.1982         Original published format: JP 23390982
[1984/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0113216
Date:11.07.1984
Language:EN
[1984/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0113216
Date:20.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0113216
Date:12.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.1986
ClassificationIPC:H03M1/78
[1989/28]
CPC:
H03M1/785 (EP,US); H03M1/06 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1984/28]H03K13/05
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1984/28]
TitleGerman:Digital-Analog-Wandler[1984/28]
English:Digital analog converter[1984/28]
French:Convertisseur numérique-analogique[1984/28]
Examination procedure29.10.1986Examination requested  [1986/52]
03.11.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.12.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.1989Fee for grant paid
01.03.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3541354  (BASHAM GARY R);
 [A]US3832707  (BUCHANAN J, et al);
 [A]FR2288424  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US])
 [A]  - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-11, no. 6, December 1976, pages 789-794, IEEE, New York, US; J.J. PRICE: "A passive laser-trimming technique to improve the linearity of a 10-bit D/A converter"
ExaminationEP0026579
 EP0028695
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.