Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0115688

EP0115688 - Reaction sintered cermet and use thereof in electrolytic cell in aluminum reaction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.1992
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.1992Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CORNING GLASS WORKS
Houghton Park Corning
New York 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/33]For all designated states
Corning Glass Works
Houghton Park
Corning New York 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DeAngelis, Thomas Peter
616 Groff Road
Horseheads New York / US
[1984/33]
Representative(s)Smith, Sydney , et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/33]Smith, Sydney , et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date83307832.221.12.1983
[1984/33]
Priority number, dateUS1982045466930.12.1982         Original published format: US 454669
US1982045467030.12.1982         Original published format: US 454670
[1984/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0115688
Date:15.08.1984
Language:EN
[1984/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0115688
Date:16.07.1986
Language:EN
[1986/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0115688
Date:17.07.1991
Language:EN
[1991/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1986
ClassificationInternational:C22C29/00, C22C1/00, C04B35/65, C04B35/58, C25C3/08
[1984/33]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1984/33]
TitleGerman:Reaktionsgesintertes cermet und seine Verwendung in elektrolytischen Zellen zur Aluminiumherstellung[1984/33]
English:Reaction sintered cermet and use thereof in electrolytic cell in aluminum reaction[1984/33]
French:Cermet fritté par réaction et son application dans les cellules électrolytiques pour la production de l'aluminium[1984/33]
Examination procedure23.12.1986Examination requested  [1987/10]
10.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.09.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.12.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.12.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.1991Fee for grant paid
12.03.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE17.07.1991
CH17.07.1991
LI17.07.1991
[1992/32]
Former [1992/07]CH17.07.1991
LI17.07.1991
Documents cited:Search[X]US3353954  (STUART WILLIAMS LLOYD);
 [X]GB901520  (PLESSEY CO LTD);
 [AD]US3143413  (KRAPF SIEGFRIED G);
 [AD]BE661802
 [X]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 26, 27th December 1982, page 314, no. 221083j, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. SHEINBERG: "Nonconventional hard-metal composition", & REPORT 1981, LA-8934,
 [X]  COMPOSITES, vol. 6, no. 2, page 86, March 1975, Haywards Heath, Sussex, GB; R. WARREN: "Refractory and wear resistant materials",
 [X]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 70, no. 24, 16th June 1969, page 99,no. 107881k, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.K. STRINGER et al.: "Reaction pressing: a new fabrication concept for intermetallic and metal-metalloid compounds", & SPEC. CERAM., PROC. SYMP. BRIT. CERAM. RES. ASS. 1967 (Pub. 1968), (4), 37-55,
Examination   Nomenclature of Inorg. Chemistry 2.cd (Definitive Rules 1970.) Issued by the Commission on the Nomencl. of Inorg. Chemistry.,