Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0123750

EP0123750 - Condensed amino pyrimidinones and their use in the treatment and prophylaxis of viral infections [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.1996
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOMEASURE, INC.
11-15 E. Avenue Hopkinton
Massachusetts / US
[N/P]
Former [1984/45]For all designated states
BIOMEASURE INC.
11-15 E. Avenue
Hopkinton Massachusetts / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sun, Hyuk Kim
20 Whitney Street
Chestnut Hill Massachusetts / US
[1984/45]
Representative(s)Deans, Michael John Percy , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1984/45]Deans, Michael John Percy , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R OAE / GB
Application number, filing date83307993.229.12.1983
[1984/45]
Priority number, dateUS1982045473230.12.1982         Original published format: US 454732
US1983054177713.10.1983         Original published format: US 541777
[1984/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0123750
Date:07.11.1984
Language:EN
[1984/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0123750
Date:26.04.1995
Language:EN
[1995/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1984
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/70, C07D239/95, A61K31/505
[1984/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1984/45]
TitleGerman:Anniellierte Aminopyrimidinone und deren Verwendung für die Behandlung und Prophylaxe von viralen Infektionen[1984/45]
English:Condensed amino pyrimidinones and their use in the treatment and prophylaxis of viral infections[1984/45]
French:Aminopyrimidinones condensées et leur utilisation dans le traitement et la prophylaxie d'infections virales[1984/45]
Examination procedure02.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/29]
26.03.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.11.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.07.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.11.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1988Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.10.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.1994Fee for grant paid
21.12.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination11.04.1988Appeal received No.  T0383/88
15.06.1988Statement of grounds filed
12.12.1991Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1991/50]
13.05.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/20]
24.08.1992Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1992/35]
23.10.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/43]
01.12.1992Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
01.12.1992Date of oral proceedings
08.12.1992Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)27.01.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 08
18.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 09
24.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 10
24.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]US3257400  (WAGNER HANS A);
 [X]US3257401  (WAGNER HANS A)
 [X]  - INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 9, March 1971, pages 201-206
by applicantUS4345195