Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0123750 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0123750



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 344
05.03.1996 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.01.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.03.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.12.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.12.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.12.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.12.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.12.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.10.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
29.07.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
29.07.1994 Description Search / examination 2
29.07.1994 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.03.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.03.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
03.03.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
31.01.1994 Description Search / examination 4
31.01.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.12.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.11.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
29.11.1993 Description Search / examination 3
29.11.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.03.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.12.1992 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.12.1992 Claims Appeal 3
01.12.1992 Claims Appeal 5
01.12.1992 Claims Appeal 5
01.12.1992 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
17.11.1992 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.11.1992 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.10.1992 Claims Appeal 1
23.10.1992 Claims Appeal 1
23.10.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.10.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.10.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
23.10.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
23.10.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
23.10.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
24.08.1992 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 2
13.05.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
13.05.1992 Claims Appeal 2
13.05.1992 Claims Appeal 1
13.05.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
28.04.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.04.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
02.03.1992 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.02.1992 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.12.1991 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 2
29.11.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
11.10.1988 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
15.06.1988 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.06.1988 Claims Appeal 4
15.06.1988 Claims Appeal 3
15.06.1988 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
10.06.1988 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
14.04.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.04.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.02.1988 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 13
23.11.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.11.1987 Description Search / examination 2
11.11.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.09.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.07.1987 Claims Search / examination 5
02.07.1987 Description Search / examination 3
02.07.1987 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.04.1987 Claims Search / examination 5
06.04.1987 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.11.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
27.11.1986 Description Search / examination 10
27.11.1986 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.10.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.10.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.07.1986 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.03.1986 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.05.1985 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.11.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.09.1984 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.07.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.07.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.07.1984 Description Search / examination 1
21.06.1984 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.06.1984 European search report Search / examination 2
21.05.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.04.1984 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
03.04.1984 Claims Search / examination 2
03.04.1984 Description Search / examination 2
03.04.1984 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.03.1984 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.03.1984 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.03.1984 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
26.03.1984 Priority document Search / examination 24
26.03.1984 Priority document Search / examination 19
08.02.1984 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
08.02.1984 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
29.12.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.12.1983 Claims Search / examination 4
29.12.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.12.1983 Description Search / examination 12
29.12.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.12.1983 Drawings Search / examination 1
29.12.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
29.12.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 8
29.12.1983 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
29.12.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11