Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0096631

EP0096631 - Process and plant for obtaining a fat product entirely comparable to butter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  09.08.1991
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COOPERATIVE AGRICOLE LA NOELLE ANCENIS, en abrégé CANA
B.P. 102
F-44150 Ancenis / FR
[1983/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Terrien, Claude
376, rue des Maitres
F-44150 St Gereon / FR
02 / Lemay, Bernard
319, Allée des Bleuets
F-44150 Ancenis / FR
[1983/51]
Representative(s)Phélip, Bruno , et al
Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1983/51]Phélip, Bruno , et al
c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date83401108.201.06.1983
[1983/51]
Priority number, dateFR1982000968603.06.1982         Original published format: FR 8209686
[1983/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0096631
Date:21.12.1983
Language:FR
[1983/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0096631
Date:13.08.1986
Language:FR
[1986/33]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0096631
Date:25.09.1991
Language:FR
[1991/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.1983
ClassificationInternational:A23D7/02
[1991/39]
Former International [1983/51]A23D3/02, A23D5/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/51]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erhalten eines der Butter vollkommen ähnlichen Fettproduktes[1983/51]
English:Process and plant for obtaining a fat product entirely comparable to butter[1983/51]
French:Procédé et installation pour l'obtention d'un produit gras en tout point comparable au beurre[1983/51]
Examination procedure14.06.1984Examination requested  [1984/35]
02.01.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.02.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.05.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.10.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.1986Fee for grant paid
06.01.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.1987  24.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Krayer, Warner Dirk
c/o Koninklijke Nederlandse Zuivelbond FNZ Volmerlaan 7
NL-2280 HV Rijswijk (ZH) / NL
Opponent's representative
Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J.
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1987/29]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.1987  24.06.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Krayer, Warner Dirk
c/o Koninklijke Nederlandse Zuivelbond FNZ Volmerlaan 7
NL-2280 HV Rijswijk (ZH) / NL
Opponent's representative
Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir.
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
25.06.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.12.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.01.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
11.05.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.12.1988Date of oral proceedings
18.01.1989Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.04.1989Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.02.1991Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.04.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.06.1991Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition21.06.1989Appeal received No.  T0411/89
04.08.1989Statement of grounds filed
20.12.1990Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.1985Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.1986
SE31.08.1986
[2015/21]
Former [1989/39]AT13.08.1986
SE31.08.1986
BE30.06.1989
Former [1989/16]AT13.08.1986
SE31.08.1986
Former [1987/22]AT13.08.1986
Documents cited:Search[A]US4315955  (CRAMER GLEN G);
 [AD]FR1573970