Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0096631 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0096631



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 340
08.10.1991 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
20.08.1991 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.08.1991 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.06.1991 English translation of the claims Opposition 4
05.06.1991 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
05.06.1991 German translation of the claims Opposition 5
09.04.1991 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
09.04.1991 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
09.04.1991 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
21.03.1991 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
04.02.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.02.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.01.1991 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
14.02.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.02.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.01.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
11.01.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.12.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
22.12.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.08.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.08.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.08.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.08.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
04.08.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.07.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.07.1989 Refund of fees Appeal 1
13.07.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.06.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.04.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.04.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.04.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
24.04.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.1989 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
31.03.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.03.1989 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Opposition 1
15.03.1989 Matter concerning the application Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.01.1989 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
18.01.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.1989 Text intended for grant Opposition 12
09.01.1989 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
06.12.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
09.09.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.09.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.08.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.08.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.08.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.08.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.08.1988 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.08.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
03.08.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
02.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
02.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
19.07.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.07.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.07.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.07.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.06.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.06.1988 Request for documents Opposition 1
01.06.1988 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
11.05.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
23.03.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.03.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.01.1988 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
24.12.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.12.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
24.12.1987 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
28.10.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.06.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
25.06.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.06.1987 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.06.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 2
24.06.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 10
27.05.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
27.05.1987 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.05.1987 Communication requesting translation of notice of opposition Opposition 1
27.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.05.1987 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
13.05.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
13.05.1987 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
13.05.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
13.05.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.05.1987 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
13.05.1987 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.05.1987 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.07.1986 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.05.1986 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
17.01.1986 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.01.1986 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.01.1986 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
23.10.1985 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
09.07.1985 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.07.1985 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
21.05.1985 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
08.05.1985 Claims Search / examination 1
08.05.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.03.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.02.1985 Claims Search / examination 4
14.02.1985 Description Search / examination 2
14.02.1985 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.01.1985 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.06.1984 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.06.1984 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
03.01.1984 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
27.10.1983 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.10.1983 Final instructions concerning extension or validation states Search / examination 1
11.10.1983 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.10.1983 European search report Search / examination 1
28.07.1983 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.07.1983 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.07.1983 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
01.06.1983 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.06.1983 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
01.06.1983 Claims Search / examination 3
01.06.1983 Description Search / examination 15
01.06.1983 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.06.1983 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.06.1983 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
01.06.1983 Priority document Search / examination 11
01.06.1983 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
04.02.1983 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1